NY A00969 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - print number 969a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - print number 969a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the retrain and employ unemployed persons program providing grants to community colleges to develop training programs or improve existing workforce development programs for the purposes of training unemployed individuals for jobs in the regions surrounding such community colleges.
Title
Establishes the retrain and employ unemployed persons program providing grants to community colleges to develop training programs or improve existing workforce development programs for the purposes of training unemployed individuals for jobs in the regions surrounding such community colleges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Assembly | print number 969a |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02232 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - referred to higher education