NY A00963 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - substituted by s901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to supermarkets providing excess edible food to food relief organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to supermarkets providing excess edible food to food relief organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01Assemblysubstituted by s901
2021-01-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.40
2021-01-20Assemblyreported
2021-01-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S00901 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.63

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback