NY A00954 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the director of the office of information technology services to conduct a study on the use of biometric identifying technology; prohibits the use of biometric identifying technology in schools until July 1, 2022 or until the commissioner of education authorizes such purchase or utilization, whichever occurs later.
Title
Directs the director of the office of information technology services to conduct a study on the use of biometric identifying technology; prohibits the use of biometric identifying technology in schools until July 1, 2022 or until the commissioner of education authorizes such purchase or utilization, whichever occurs later.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Assembly | signed chap.2 |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.46 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S893 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.2 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.2 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00893 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A954