NY A00954 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions permitting rent increases after vacancy of a housing accommodation.
Title
Repeals provisions permitting rent increases after vacancy of a housing accommodation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.370 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S01593 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT