NY A00952 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets, in coordination with the commissioner of economic development, to work with the state's land grant university system to produce a report to provide advice, guidance, and recommendations on improving the resiliency and self-reliance of the state's farm and food supply and the related supply chain logistics to address food shortages, food waste, and the inability to get New York farm goods to markets that occurred as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic, with the goal of creating permanent solutions beyond the state of emergency to reflect the changing wholesale, retail and consumer marketplace; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets, in coordination with the commissioner of economic development, to work with the state's land grant university system to produce a report to provide advice, guidance, and recommendations on improving the resiliency and self-reliance of the state's farm and food supply and the related supply chain logistics to address food shortages, food waste, and the inability to get New York farm goods to markets that occurred as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic, with the goal of creating permanent solutions beyond the state of emergency to reflect the changing wholesale, retail and consumer marketplace; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16Senatesigned chap.24
2021-02-12Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-02-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-02-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-03Senate3RD READING CAL.76
2021-02-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1305
2021-02-01SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-02-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-02-01Assemblypassed assembly
2021-01-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.39
2021-01-20Assemblyreported
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S01305 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A952

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback