NY A00951 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.
Title
Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | Senate | signed chap.148 |
2019-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.47 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S231 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.39 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.39 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00231 (Same As) 2019-08-07 - signed chap.148