NY A00951 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-19Senate3RD READING CAL.47
2019-03-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S231
2019-03-19SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-19Assemblyhome rule request
2019-03-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.39
2019-03-19Assemblyrules report cal.39
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-03-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S00231 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A951

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00951&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00951&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00951
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00951&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00951&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00951&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00951&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A951#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00951&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback