NY A00950 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the superintendent of financial services shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Title
Provides that the superintendent of financial services shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 950c |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.58 |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading 950b |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.118 |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | print number 950a |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06407 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 6407B