NY A00944 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s953a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s953a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses that make payments in lieu of taxes to provide agencies, local governments and school districts with notice of their intention to file for a change in assessment.
Title
Requires businesses that make payments in lieu of taxes to provide agencies, local governments and school districts with notice of their intention to file for a change in assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s953a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.284 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | print number 944a |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00953 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.799