NY A00937 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-09 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-09 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires at least one full-time licensed social worker to be employed in each elementary, intermediate, middle and junior high school throughout the state.
Title
Requires at least one full-time licensed social worker to be employed in each elementary, intermediate, middle and junior high school throughout the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | print number 937a |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |