NY A00924 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "public body" to include any entity created or appointed to perform a necessary function in the decision-making process.
Title
Amends the definition of "public body" to include any entity created or appointed to perform a necessary function in the decision-making process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.66 |
2021-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.676 |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.464 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1625A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.286 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.286 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | print number 924a |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01625 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A924A