NY A00916 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - advanced to third reading cal.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the department of corrections and community supervision shall provide an inmate, upon his or her discharge, with educational information about the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV), instructions about how to obtain free HIV testing and referrals to community-based HIV prevention, education and counseling resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the department of corrections and community supervision shall provide an inmate, upon his or her discharge, with educational information about the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV), instructions about how to obtain free HIV testing and referrals to community-based HIV prevention, education and counseling resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.322
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S05945 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback