NY A00881 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-7)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a temporary extension for payment of real property taxes owed by a person who has been either a furloughed or designated non-pay federal employee due to a period of a lapse in discretionary appropriations by the federal government, or by the spouse or domestic partner of such person; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a temporary extension for payment of real property taxes owed by a person who has been either a furloughed or designated non-pay federal employee due to a period of a lapse in discretionary appropriations by the federal government, or by the spouse or domestic partner of such person; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01Senatesigned chap.9
2019-01-25Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-01-23SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-23Senate3RD READING CAL.38
2019-01-23SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1675
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-01-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-15Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.11
2019-01-14Assemblyrules report cal.11
2019-01-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01675 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A881

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00881
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A881#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback