NY A00881 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the boards of education in union free school districts and central school districts to establish wards for the purpose of school board elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the boards of education in union free school districts and central school districts to establish wards for the purpose of school board elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2078
2017-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6599
2017-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.364
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.364
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-06-02Assemblyprint number 881a
2017-06-02Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S06599 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A881A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00881
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00881A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00881&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A881#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback