NY A00876 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.
Title
Requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.43 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.275 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02829 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION