NY A00876 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.275
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-11Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S02829 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - referred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback