NY A00859 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Bans the sale of employment data reports without written consumer consent; provides such employment data reports shall include, but not be limited to, payroll and earnings information, hours worked, consumer history and health insurance information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bans the sale of employment data reports without written consumer consent; provides such employment data reports shall include, but not be limited to, payroll and earnings information, hours worked, consumer history and health insurance information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2018-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.60
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.368
2017-05-16Assemblyreported
2017-05-04Assemblyprint number 859a
2017-05-04Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2017-03-01Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S06577 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00859&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00859&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00859
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00859&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00859A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00859&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00859&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00859&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback