NY A00846 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the natural gas exploration and extraction liability act of 2014.
Title
Establishes the natural gas exploration and extraction liability act of 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | print number 846a |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04045 (Same As) 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 4045A