NY A00844 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s979a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s979a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real estate brokers to receive two hours of training in cultural competency.
Title
Requires real estate brokers to receive two hours of training in cultural competency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s979a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.749 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | print number 844a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00979 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.75