NY A00837 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - amended on third reading 837a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the publication of immunization information; requires schools to provide immunization information to the commissioner of health; requires the department of health to make immunization information, including rates of immunization, available on its website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the publication of immunization information; requires schools to provide immunization information to the commissioner of health; requires the department of health to make immunization information, including rates of immunization, available on its website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08Assemblyamended on third reading 837a
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.27
2023-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.183
2023-05-22Assemblyrules report cal.183
2023-05-22Assemblyreported
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-01-11Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01946 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1946A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback