NY A00837 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the creation and imposition of restrictive commercial practices and stringent recordkeeping and reporting to prevent gun sales to individuals with a criminal record; provides that such measures shall be promulgated by the superintendent of state police; restricts premises of sales; requires employee training; prohibits straw purchases; imposes additional license conditions.
Title
Requires the creation and imposition of restrictive commercial practices and stringent recordkeeping and reporting to prevent gun sales to individuals with a criminal record; provides that such measures shall be promulgated by the superintendent of state police; restricts premises of sales; requires employee training; prohibits straw purchases; imposes additional license conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-05-30 | Assembly | print number 837e |
2022-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 837d |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 837c |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | print number 837b |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 837a |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08780 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - PRINT NUMBER 8780A