NY A00833 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-20Assemblyprint number 833a
2019-02-20Assemblyamend and recommit to correction
2019-01-11Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S02161 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback