NY A00833 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.422
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.422
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a gift for eliminating the stigma relating to mental illness on personal income tax returns; establishes the mental illness anti-stigma fund into which such gifts shall be deposited; directs the monies in such fund be used by the office of mental health to provide grants to organizations dedicated to eliminating the stigma attached to mental illness and those with mental health needs.
Title
Establishes a gift for eliminating the stigma relating to mental illness on personal income tax returns; establishes the mental illness anti-stigma fund into which such gifts shall be deposited; directs the monies in such fund be used by the office of mental health to provide grants to organizations dedicated to eliminating the stigma attached to mental illness and those with mental health needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.422 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S632A |
2015-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.174 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | print number 833a |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00632 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A833A