NY A00821 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - print number 821a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - print number 821a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licensing laser hair removal technicians; establishes laser hair removal rules and regulations.
Title
Relates to licensing laser hair removal technicians; establishes laser hair removal rules and regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | print number 821a |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02834 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES