NY A00812 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "port authority of New York and New Jersey transparency and accountability act of 2015"; relates to the functioning of the port authority as an open, transparent and accountable interstate public authority.
Title
Enacts the "port authority of New York and New Jersey transparency and accountability act of 2015"; relates to the functioning of the port authority as an open, transparent and accountable interstate public authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.5 |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | rules report cal.5 |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01429 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS