NY A00807 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - approval memo.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - approval memo.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring insurance coverage for pre-exposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV and post-exposure prophylaxis to prevent HIV infection.
Title
Relates to requiring insurance coverage for pre-exposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV and post-exposure prophylaxis to prevent HIV infection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.43 |
2022-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.721 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1521 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S688 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.50 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.159 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00688 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A807