NY A00797 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the public service commission to develop a formula for the calculation of a residential water cost index; requires each water works corporation and municipal water system serving one thousand customers or more to calculate and submit to the public service commission its residential water cost index; requires the public service commission to publish a report on the residential water cost index of each applicable water works corporation and municipal water system.
Title
Requires the public service commission to develop a formula for the calculation of a residential water cost index; requires each water works corporation and municipal water system serving one thousand customers or more to calculate and submit to the public service commission its residential water cost index; requires the public service commission to publish a report on the residential water cost index of each applicable water works corporation and municipal water system.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.464 |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02938 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS