NY A00794 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Title
Relates to the offenses of rape in the first, second and third degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 794e |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 794d |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.40 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO CODES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 794c |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.55 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.55 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | print number 794b |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | print number 794a |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |