NY A00783 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - print number 783a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - print number 783a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage New Yorkers to prepare for emergencies by through tax incentives.
Title
Establishes the "emergency preparedness month act" and exempts prefabricated go-bags and individual emergency preparedness items from sales tax during specified time periods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | print number 783a | |
2010-02-23 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental operations | |
2009-01-07 | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S3927-A (Same As) 2010-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3927A