NY A00780 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - SIGNED CHAP.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - SIGNED CHAP.6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the tenth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.
Title
Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the tenth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.6 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-01-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ruling of chair on point of order |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ruling of chair on point of order |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.9 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | substituted for a780 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.8 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | substituted by s1102 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.9 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01102 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - SIGNED CHAP.6