NY A00777 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - substituted by s1048
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day and provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day and provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage.

Sponsors

Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Taylor Raynor [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. David Gantt [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14Assemblysubstituted by s1048
2019-01-14Assemblyrules report cal.6
2019-01-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to judiciary
2019-01-11Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-01-10Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01048 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback