NY A00776 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.
Title
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | signed chap.4 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-01-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1101 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.5 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.5 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01101 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - signed chap.4