NY A00775 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state.

Sponsors

Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]
Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Taylor Raynor [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. David Gantt [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]

Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24Senatesigned chap.3
2019-01-14Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-01-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-14Senate3RD READING CAL.5
2019-01-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1099
2019-01-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-01-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.4
2019-01-14Assemblyrules report cal.4
2019-01-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-10Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01099 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A775

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00775&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00775&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00775
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00775&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00775&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A775#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00775&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A775#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback