NY A00770 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll and transit records, with exceptions.
Title
Prohibits the disclosure of highway, bridge, tunnel and other thoroughfare toll and transit records, with exceptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.49 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.158 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.158 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | print number 770a |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02784 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CODES