NY A00766 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to securing payment of wages for work already performed; creates a lien remedy for all employees; provides grounds for attachment; relates to procedures where employees may hold shareholders of non-publicly traded corporations personally liable for wage theft; relates to rights for victims of wage theft to hold the ten members with the largest ownership interests in a company personally liable for wage theft.
Title
Relates to securing payment of wages for work already performed; creates a lien remedy for all employees; provides grounds for attachment; relates to procedures where employees may hold shareholders of non-publicly traded corporations personally liable for wage theft; relates to rights for victims of wage theft to hold the ten members with the largest ownership interests in a company personally liable for wage theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.48 |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.343 |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02762 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES