NY A00749 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the maximum fine for persons who violate the law regulating telemarketing to twenty thousand dollars.
Title
Raises the maximum fine for persons who violate the law regulating telemarketing to twenty thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | print number 749b |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 749 |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | print number 749a |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04515 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION