NY A00747 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - substituted by s1047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination based on gender identity or expression; defines "gender identity or expression" as having or being perceived as having a gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression whether or not that gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression is different from that traditionally associated with the sex assigned to that person at birth; further includes offenses regarding gender identity or expression within the list of offenses subject to treatment as hate crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits discrimination based on gender identity or expression; defines "gender identity or expression" as having or being perceived as having a gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression whether or not that gender identity, self image, appearance, behavior or expression is different from that traditionally associated with the sex assigned to that person at birth; further includes offenses regarding gender identity or expression within the list of offenses subject to treatment as hate crimes.

Sponsors

Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]
Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]

Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15Assemblysubstituted by s1047
2019-01-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.2
2019-01-14Assemblyrules report cal.2
2019-01-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01047 (Same As) 2019-01-25 - SIGNED CHAP.8

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback