NY A00735 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - signed chap.635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - signed chap.635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a community gardens task force.
Title
Relates to a community gardens task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-01 | Assembly | signed chap.635 |
2021-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1630 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3152A |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.37 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S03152 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A735