NY A00722 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to organize, sponsor, conduct, promote, or participate in any animal killing contest, competition, tournament or derby where the objective of such contest or competition is to take the largest number of small game, wild birds, other than wild turkeys, and domestic game birds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to organize, sponsor, conduct, promote, or participate in any animal killing contest, competition, tournament or derby where the objective of such contest or competition is to take the largest number of small game, wild birds, other than wild turkeys, and domestic game birds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-04Assemblyprint number 722b
2019-06-04Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-05-17Assemblyprint number 722a
2019-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S04253 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4253B
S07542 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback