NY A00715 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.
Title
Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.44 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.288 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02783 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES