NY A00706 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows school districts to permit home-schooled students to participate in district interscholastic sports.
Title
Allows school districts to permit home-schooled students to participate in district interscholastic sports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | print number 706a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05472 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION