NY A00703 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of lead ammunition in the taking of wildlife on wildlife management areas, state forests, forest preserves, state parks or any other state-owned land that is open for hunting and on land contributing surface water to the New York city water supply.
Title
Prohibits the use of lead ammunition in the taking of wildlife on wildlife management areas, state forests, forest preserves, state parks or any other state-owned land that is open for hunting and on land contributing surface water to the New York city water supply.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.415 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |