NY A00702 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s2211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prohibition of double-bunked housing in correctional facilities.
Title
Relates to the prohibition of double-bunked housing in correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s2211 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.411 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02211 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.570