NY A00702 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires post completion certifications to be completed, under penalty of perjury, that the MWBE performed the work, performed the services, or delivered the materials; that the division of minority and women's business development create an internet registry, and perform inspections of MWBEs to weed out fraud and abuse; that additional regulations to be adopted related to revocations of certifications for felony convictions for fraudulently misrepresenting the status of an MWBE; permits a court to issue fines double the amount that should have been paid to an MWBE upon conviction for felony fraud related to the MWBE program.
Title
Requires post completion certifications to be completed, under penalty of perjury, that the MWBE performed the work, performed the services, or delivered the materials; that the division of minority and women's business development create an internet registry, and perform inspections of MWBEs to weed out fraud and abuse; that additional regulations to be adopted related to revocations of certifications for felony convictions for fraudulently misrepresenting the status of an MWBE; permits a court to issue fines double the amount that should have been paid to an MWBE upon conviction for felony fraud related to the MWBE program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.56 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.71 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.71 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03807 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE