NY A00702 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 702a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 702a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the DEC from restricting the burning of garbage, refuse or rubbish in an open fire on land possessed by a single family or any part of a farm under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits the DEC from restricting the burning of garbage, refuse or rubbish in an open fire on land possessed by a single family or any part of a farm under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Assembly | print number 702a |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04286 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 4286A