NY A00697 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - advanced to third reading cal.357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - advanced to third reading cal.357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain entities may not require a person to provide a copy of his or her criminal history record under certain circumstances.
Title
Provides that certain entities may not require a person to provide a copy of his or her criminal history record under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.357 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01793 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS