NY A00690 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - amended on third reading 690a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - amended on third reading 690a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing notice of voting rights to persons released from local jails including written information distributed by the board of elections.
Title
Relates to providing notice of voting rights to persons released from local jails including written information distributed by the board of elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 690a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.43 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.284 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.284 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01796 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION