NY A00686 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.900
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.900
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a child less than ten years of age from being left unattended in a motor vehicle under conditions presenting substantial risk.
Title
Prohibits a child less than ten years of age from being left unattended in a motor vehicle under conditions presenting substantial risk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.900 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | print number 686b |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | print number 686a |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05631 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - referred to codes