NY A00667 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

De-criminalizes the personal possession of marijuana; relates to certain pleas; specifies requirements with respect to bills affecting correctional populations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

De-criminalizes the personal possession of marijuana; relates to certain pleas; specifies requirements with respect to bills affecting correctional populations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02736 (Same As) 2017-01-17 - REFERRED TO CODES
S07013 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - DEFEATED IN CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback