NY A00661 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s412a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s412a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to gambling and the creation of a self-exclusion request for removal form.
Title
Relates to gambling and the creation of a self-exclusion request for removal form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s412a |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.699 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.699 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | print number 661a |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S00412 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.564